THE DAVID GARRICK SCHOLARSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity activities involve the advancement of education and the performing arts for the benefits of the public, including awarding scholarships to individuals studying drama in their final year of study at a university, college or institution of higher or further education. The scholarship awards to the successful applicants are paid directly to the education institution for study fees only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Pigott KBEK, OBE | Chair | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID COURTNEY SUCHET CBE | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee Menzies | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
His Hon. Judge David MacLaren Webster | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
GARETH JOHNSON | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.40k | £173.14k | £13.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.97k | £25.79k | £115.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS TO INDIVIDUALS STUDYING AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE CHARITY TRUSTEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GARRICK CLUB
15 GARRICK STREET
LONDON
WC2E 9AY
- Phone:
- 02073796478
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window