INVICTUS PROPHETIC NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Canada
- France
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Netherlands
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Sweden
- Uganda
- United States
Governance
- 16 July 2020: Standard registration
- Invictus Kingdom Ministries (Working name)
- INVICTUS PROPHETIC GLOBAL (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Anne Sendall-King | Chair | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Gwyn Parry | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Heather Joy Clayton | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Barrett | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cummins Mr | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.21k | £42.87k | £75.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.00k | £60.58k | £86.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION - TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE BASIS OF FAITH, BY PARTNERING WITH CHURCHES, MISSION GROUPS, NGO'S GLOBALLY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION - TO DELIVER TEACHING ON THE PROPHETIC GIFTINGS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY USE OF INFORMATION, MEDIA, SUCH AS THE INTERNET, RADIO, TV SEMINARS, CONFERENCES, LECTURES, WRITTEN MATERIAL AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. EXCLUSIVELY OR PARTNERING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO MEET NEED AND ALLEVIATE SUFFERING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llys Y Wennol
Llanbedr Dyffryn Clwyd
RUTHIN
Denbighshire
LL15 1TB
- Phone:
- +44 7847882251
- Email:
- llysywennol@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window