EXOVENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Exovent team was formed in March 2020 with the objective of helping the UK, and the world, address the challenge of COVID-19. Our remit has now widened to provide respiratory support devices for acute and chronic respiratory disease, the third commonest cause of death worldwide. Portsmouth Aviation and our increasing team of medics, engineers, scientists and enablers relentlessly progress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- India
- Pakistan
- Qatar
Governance
- 16 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ejaz Latif Khan | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ian ROSE | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Mckeown | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anil Patel | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Emily Hodges | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heather Lambert | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROF DAVID HOWARD FRCSFRCSEd | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.07k | £5.16k | £1.00k | £2.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.93k | £2.02k | £1.00k | £2.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS INCLUDING BY: 2.1.1 CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO EFFECTIVE AND EFFICIENT METHODS OF VENTILATION FOR PATIENTS WITH PNEUMONIA AND OTHER RESPIRATORY CONDITIONS REQUIRING BREATHING SUPPORT; 2.1.2 DEVELOPING VENTILATION TECHNOLOGY ON THE BASIS OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, INCLUDING ACCESSIBLE AND AFFORDABLE VENTILATION SUPPORT DEVICES FOR USE AROUND THE WORLD; AND 2.1.3 SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING THE USE OF APPROPRIATE VENTILATOR DEVICES WHICH ARE EASY AND SAFE TO USE AND REPLICATE GLOBALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Garson Lane
Wraysbury
STAINES-UPON-THAMES
Middlesex
Berkshire
TW19 5JF
- Phone:
- 07785970647
- Email:
- contact@exovent.info
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window