THE BERNICIA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Foundation are to provide for the relief of those in need by reason of poverty, homelessness, old age, mental or physical disability or ill health by the provision of grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or organisations working to relieve such needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Moody | Chair | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teri Ann Bayliss | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
AVRIL GIBSON | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Meredith | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £502.60k | £300.00k | £200.00k | £200.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £508.46k | £221.59k | £259.00k | £202.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £502.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £508.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £40.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £467.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 1. PROVIDE AND MANAGE HOUSING, INCLUDING SOCIAL HOUSING, AND PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR POOR PEOPLE OR FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; AND / OR 2. DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF ANY SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND / OR 3. PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; AND / OR 4. PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; AND / OR 5. PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND / OR 6. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; AND / OR 7. PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION; AND / OR 8. SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE REGISTERED PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING IN ACHIEVING ITS CHARITABLE OBJECTS; AND / OR 9. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT FROM TIME TO TIME BY A CHARITY REGISTERED AS A REGISTERED PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WITH THE REGULATOR OF SOCIAL HOUSING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BERNICIA
OAKWOOD WAY
ASHWOOD BUSINESS PARK
ASHINGTON
NE63 0XF
- Phone:
- 03448003800
- Email:
- jenny.allinson@bernicia.com
- Website:
-
berniciafoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window