THE RECRUITMENT JUNCTION

Charity Number: 1191442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Recruitment Junction is a recruitment agency for ex-offenders. We are a not-for-profit enterprise with a social heart, on a commercial mission. Our vision is to see people with convictions rediscover a sense of purpose through work and become role models who drive positive generational impact across their families.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £437,334
Total expenditure: £342,003

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Cameron Boyd Mann Chair 27 September 2020
None on record
Mark Nicholas Simpson Trustee 28 October 2024
THE JUNCTION 42 FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARGARET KAY LAWSON Trustee 27 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY JESMOND, NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £138.32k £328.95k £263.72k £437.33k
Total expenditure £76.73k £204.93k £238.99k £342.00k
Income from government contracts £61.20k £138.47k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £92.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 04 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 21 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Milburn House
19 Dean Street
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE1 1PQ
Phone:
0191 560 0232