FOURAH BAY COLLEGE ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial support and scholarships, assist in providing teaching and learning resources and safe teaching and learning environment to improve quality of education. To undertake projects to safeguard against a relapse of degradation and degeneration in the College and refurbish key pre-existing infrastructures including college buildings such as the library and sanitation facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 15 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Magnus Nathaniel Cole | Chair | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bamikole Roberts | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Fatumata Gassama | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Madonna Sandra Coward | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROWLAND GORDON | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Sadiku Dabo | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.75k | £2.41k | £2.75k | £12.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £350 | £3.07k | £2.40k | £8.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ALL STUDENTS AT FOURAH BAY COLLEGE, UNIVERSITY OF SIERRA LEONE IN FREETOWN IN SIERRA LEONE, BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE IN VARIOUS WAYS ON THE BASIS OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, WITH MUTUAL RESPECT AND POSITIVE ENCOURAGEMENT IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND CONTRIBUTE TO THEIR ACADEMIC, PROFESSIONAL AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE. 2. TO RELIEVE STUDENTS OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN THE FORM OF ASSISTANCE PACKAGES AND SCHOLARSHIPS WHERE NECESSARY. 3. TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF EDUCATION AT FOURAH BAY COLLEGE BY PROVIDING TEACHING AND LEARNING RESOURCES AND A SAFE TEACHING AND LEARNING ENVIRONMENT FOR STUDENTS IN SIERRA LEONE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 16
Sarnesfield House
Pencraig Way
London
SE15 1ND
- Phone:
- 07754105594
- Email:
- fbcukaa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window