THE SERCO PEOPLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Serco People Fund supports Serco colleagues and their close families facing extraordinary financial challenges. The People Fund embraces Serco's value of Care, providing support to colleagues and their families in times of need. As an independent charity we do this by providing grants in response to applications from colleagues and, where helpful, connecting them to other assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
Governance
- 16 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CHARLES EVELEIGH | Chair | 16 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Bartram | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stevie-Louise Williams | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Withecombe | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Walton | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Planner | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEX FERGUSON | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES GRASSBY | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.06m | £144.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.95k | £468.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.05m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £198.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.28k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 August 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 August 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Apr 2021 as amended on 31 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
For the public benefit, to relieve poverty, directly or indirectly, among current employees or retired employees of Serco (or its associated businesses) and their dependants or immediate relatives (which shall mean spouses, children and grandchildren).
Contact information
- Address:
-
SERCO GROUP PLC
SERCO HOUSE
16 BARTLEY WOOD BUSINESS PARK
BARTLEY WAY
HOOK
RG27 9UY
- Phone:
- 0345 010 4000
- Email:
- info@sercopeoplefund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window