SPEKE COMMUNITY CENTRE ( THE COMMY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
general charitable purposes, support persons with disabilities, the prevention or relief of poverty, economic/community development/employment and recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 30 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Vanessa Hill | Chair | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Mary Rasmussen | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Doreen Knight | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mark William Ord | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.23k | £15.56k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.31k | £18.62k | £9.66k | £10.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.69k | £13.92k | £10.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 October 2023 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 October 2023 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 June 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 June 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF SPEKE COMMUNITY CENTRE (THE COMMY) ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SPEKE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPEKE TRAINING & EDUCATION CENTRE
UNIT HOUSE
SPEKE BOULEVARD
LIVERPOOL
L24 9HZ
- Phone:
- 01514864933
- Email:
- speketraining@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window