THE GWENT BAPTIST ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Gwent Baptist Association, part of the Baptist Union of Wales, seeks to provide fellowship, encouragement, opportunity for ministry and community outreach and an avenue of partnership among Baptist churches in its area. It gives prayerful, practical and financial support, training, advice and other resources for its churches and leaders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 09 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID MARC OWEN | Chair | 08 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Alice Hall Place | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Pamela Jean Moody | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev SUSAN JANE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev TIMOTHY IAN MOODY | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
REVEREND THOMAS RICHARD HARRISON | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Keith Fordham | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
HUW STEPHENS MA BEd | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Richard John Miles | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Jonathan Forman | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Suzanne Hannah Roberts | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302 | £4.60k | £4.90k | £7.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.71k | £20.10k | £24.65k | £33.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE COUNTY OF GWENT ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 5.1 TO SPREAD THE GOOD NEWS OF JESUS CHRIST AS REVEALED IN THE BIBLE; 5.2 TO SUPPORT CHURCHES IN GWENT IN MAINTAINING MINISTRIES AND ASSISTING THEM IN ENGAGING IN MISSION WORK; 5.3 TO NURTURE AMONG ITS MEMBERS RESPECT, LOVE AND CO-OPERATION FOR AND WITH ONE ANOTHER WHILE ACKNOWLEDGING THE INDEPENDENCE OF EVERY CHURCH IN MATTERS RELATING TO ITS OWN GOVERNMENT AND DISCIPLINE; 5.4 TO CONFER AND SEEK CO-OPERATION WITH BAPTISTS IN GWENT AND OTHER PARTS OF WALES AND THE UK, AND WITH OTHER CHURCHES AND CHRISTIAN BODIES IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE KINGDOM OF CHRIST; 5.5 TO SAFEGUARD THE PROPERTIES AND INTERESTS OF THE ASSOCIATION AND THE CHURCHES, AND TO CONSIDER THE MOST APPROPRIATE MEANS TO NURTURE THESE RESOURCES FOR THE GOOD OF THE ASSOCIATION, THE CHURCHES AND THE KINGDOM OF CHRIST; 5.6 TO USE ANY OTHER MEANS IN HARMONY WITH THE MAIN AIM OF THE ASSOCIATION, AS DECIDED BY THE COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME, IN ORDER TO FURTHER THE WORK OF THE DENOMINATION IN GWENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Millers Wood
Penmaen
BLACKWOOD
Gwent
NP12 0FE
- Phone:
- 07896198285
- Email:
- PAMELAMOODY6@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
gwentbaptists.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window