CYNGHRAIR SEIRIOL ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop the capacity and skills of socially, economically or otherwise disadvantaged members of the community of Seiriol and the surrounding area, in such a way that their needs can be more effectively identified and met and that they are empowered to participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,725 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 06 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Joy Rendle | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Gethyn Wyn Rowlands | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Jones | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Barbara Ann Williams | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert James Macaulay | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Janet Eileen Owens | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr STEPHEN MACVICAR | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN ALWYN ROWLANDS | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Ifan Morgan | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Diana Bell | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.53k | £75.13k | £40.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.80k | £70.04k | £58.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £92.22k | £20.00k | £6.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY, ECONOMICALLY OR OTHERWISE DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY OF SEIROL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEIR NEEDS CAN BE MORE EFFECTIVELY IDENTIFIED AND MET AND THAT THEY ARE EMPOWERED TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CANOLFAN BEAUMARIS
RATING ROW
BEAUMARIS
ANGLESEY
LL58 8AL
- Phone:
- 01248811200
- Email:
- ctdseiriolgts@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window