TOTNES MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The running and maintenance of a museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 13 October 2020: CIO registration
- 04 April 2024: Funds received from 296684 TOTNES MUSEUM TRUST
- TOTNES ELIZABETHAN HOUSE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Chandler | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ann Wilson | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||
P D BETHEL | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Thomas Kenneth Coia | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Roffey | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.19k | £17.81k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.60k | £29.03k | £31.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 January 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 30 January 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LOCAL HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF TOTNES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOTNES ELIZABETHAN HOUSE & MUSEUM
70 FORE STREET
TOTNES
TQ9 5RU
- Phone:
- 01803863821
- Email:
- info@totnesmuseum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window