Financial history ARKENDALE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 516550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £15.32k £22.44k £12.46k £20.48k £18.64k
Total expenditure £7.51k £4.89k £6.03k £13.01k £10.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.93k £2.72k N/A N/A