COMMUNITY FOOD AND FRIENDSHIP BLYTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty people in Blyth and the surrounding area by providing food, essential household items and toiletries to individuals in financial need. To promote social inclusion by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £4,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 22 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Ann Correia | Chair | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Knibbs | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Lillian Hayton | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hayton | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID COOPER | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Alan Hall | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.31k | £43.12k | £22.76k | £25.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.43k | £18.50k | £32.11k | £21.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.30k | £7.15k | £7.15k | £4.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST PEOPLE IN BLYTHE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FOOD, ESSENTIAL HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND TOILETRIES TO INDIVIDUALS IN FINANCIAL NEED. 2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BLYTHE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PREVENTING MEN FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE MEN WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Centre
Claremont Terrace
Ne24 2LE
- Phone:
- 07597374373
- Email:
- dcooper5057@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window