RAISE YOUR VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise Your Voice is a music project for vulnerable people living with dementia and their carers, based in the area around Lewes, East Sussex. Each session is run by two professional musicians, (singer and pianist). They are supported by a team of volunteers with a wealth of experience of working with vulnerable adults in social care, as well as in the legal profession.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 21 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Alison Dunford BA Hons MA | Chair | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
R H CLOW | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN SYMONDS | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Wallis | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.93k | £11.93k | £8.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.53k | £11.84k | £16.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 17 October 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 December 2023 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SPECIFICALLY TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND RELIEF, THROUGH REGULAR SINGING SESSIONS, FOR PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA IN THE SUSSEX AREA AND THEIR CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 ROUSSILLON COTTAGES
CINDER HILL
NORTH CHAILEY
LEWES
BN8 4HP
- Phone:
- 01825723662
- Email:
- info@raiseyourvoice.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window