Trustees FRIENDS OF BOURNVILLE PARK
Charity number: 1192446

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Faye Manamley | Chair | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew John Rogers | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Andrew Mainwaring | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Benn Schofield | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Clifford Allum | Trustee | 12 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Boon Long Chong | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ANDREW HARDIE | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Professor Colin Richard Thomas | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Stuart Tyldesley Hosfield | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Samuel Philip Huw Wright | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Joan Hosfield | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.