FRIENDS OF MORTIMER FOREST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Mortimer Forest exist to help conserve and improve the natural environment and landscape in Mortimer Forest and the surrounding area. To organise activities in the forest which promote mental and physical wellbeing and public education in environmental and forest-related subjects, in cooperation where possible with other like-minded charities and Forestry England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin John Richards | Chair | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Arbuthnott | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Arbuthnott | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Frances Bradley | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Lyle | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Hugo Salwey | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Humphrey Salwey CBE TD DL | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Gillian Patricia Bilbrough | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Hepworth | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
MERLIN SPEDDING UNWIN | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN RICHARD OWEN MA | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £5.30k | £4.81k | £4.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £7.51k | £3.03k | £3.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 APR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 2.1.1 THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT WITHIN NORTH HEREFORDSHIRE AND SOUTH SHROPSHIRE IN PARTICULAR THE WOODLAND AND ITS WILDLIFE, FLORA AND FAUNA; 2.1.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECTS OF FORESTRY, CRAFT SKILLS AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND 2.1.3 THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH THROUGH PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES THAT IMPROVE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fairfield
Eyton
LEOMINSTER
HR6 0BZ
- Phone:
- 01568770218
- Email:
- richards.colin@aol.com
- Website:
-
Friends-of-mortimer-forest.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window