AMINA KHAYYAM DANCE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AKDC creates dance-theatre that is particularly concerned with issues affecting marginalised women not just from the mainstream but from within their own communities. It is from there that it draws its inspiration to tell stories as well as to shape its process -embedded in extensive workshopping that empower and stake hold women in the work. It also offers Kathak classes, and workshops for women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £135,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vineet Vijh | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ope Igbinyemi | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shine Duggal | Trustee | 08 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Atiya Gourlay | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.66k | £225.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.66k | £202.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.96k | £135.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 DEC 1899 INCORPORATED 20 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE ART OF DANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amina Khayyam Dance Company
27 Church Street
SLOUGH
Berkshire
SL1 1PL
- Phone:
- 07984656971
- Email:
- info@aminakhayyamdance.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window