The Hugh Mumford Charitable Trust

Charity number: 1192468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Access to sport in Cambridgeshire and East Anglia. Conservation, preservation and biodiversity in Cambridgeshire and East Anglia and wider UK. Trust is open to applications. Please submit your application to https://funding.ludlowtrust.com

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 21 October 2023

Total income: £75,911
Total expenditure: £33,394

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • KMHM TRUST (Previous name)
  • K&H Mumford Trust (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ludlow Trust Company Ltd Trustee 05 July 2021
THE PRANDEM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARTIN ASHLEY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ORCHARD FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GIVE FOR GOOD RUSSELL FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CAUSEWAY TRUST
Received: On time
Q CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
2104 CHARITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LONGVILLE FOUNDATION
Received: 3 days late
THE MINEKTE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Hugh Mumford Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Kate Mary Mumford Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/10/2021 21/10/2022 21/10/2023
Total gross income £40.19k £33.12k £75.91k
Total expenditure £39.53k £19.72k £33.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 October 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2023 20 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 21 October 2022 04 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2022 04 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 21 October 2021 01 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2021 01 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
Phone:
0117 313 8200