ST. PAUL'S, FURZEDOWN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public Worship. Pastoral support. Christian Education. Poor relief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 01 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Biobelemoye Susan Alagoa | Chair | 29 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Georgina Buckler | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Nunn | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clarice Joyce Neil | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Baker | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Joan Alice Poole | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Greensmith | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anita Codrington | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM CONNELL | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.85k | £103.20k | £98.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.28k | £110.97k | £77.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PAULS FURZEDOWN
CHILLERTON ROAD
LONDON
SW17 9BE
- Phone:
- 07913346202
- Email:
- poole939@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window