OPEN DOOR CHURCH

Charity number: 1192665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide religious education through regular worship services and teaching in small groups. Online courses and community engagement though community fridge.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £36,897
Total expenditure: £32,799

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Peterborough City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OPEN DOOR BAPTIST CHURCH GUNTHORPE (Working name)
  • OPEN DOOR CHURCH (Previous name)
  • OPEN DOOR CHURCH PETERBOROUGH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN JOHN WARBURTON Chair 17 September 1989
OPEN DOOR COMMUNITY ACTION TRUST
Received: On time
CROPS
Received: On time
David Key Trustee 17 July 2016
OPEN DOOR COMMUNITY ACTION TRUST
Received: On time
MARGARET JOYCE PARKES Trustee 17 September 1989
OPEN DOOR COMMUNITY ACTION TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £72.53k £54.87k £36.90k
Total expenditure £46.75k £58.63k £32.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OPEN DOOR CENTRE
73 HALLFIELDS LANE
GUNTHORPE
PETERBOROUGH
PE4 7YL
Phone:
01733708090