THE HELEN DAVIS FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1191458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity exists to fulfil the wishes of the late Helen Davis to support the work of The Methodist Church, provide educational bursaries and prizes, help relieve family poverty and aid young performers by making grants to individuals and small groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £9,561
Total expenditure: £15,704

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 September 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Anne Victoria Davis PhD Chair 21 July 2020
THE ERAYIM AID TRUST UK
Received: On time
Joshua James Davis Trustee 21 July 2024
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Whipp Trustee 21 July 2020
None on record
Edward Alexander Davis Trustee 21 July 2020
None on record
Brian Davis Trustee 21 July 2020
None on record
PETER DAVIS Trustee 21 July 2020
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE MUSIC AND PERFORMING ARTS TRUST
Received: On time
RUTLAND MUSIC TRUST
Received: 236 days late
ARTS FOR RUTLAND
Received: On time
Bethany Rose Davis Trustee 21 July 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £332.55k £6.76k £9.04k £9.56k
Total expenditure £18.76k £10.24k £10.33k £15.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 04 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 04 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FLAT 209 THE METROPOLE
THE LEAS
FOLKESTONE
CT20 2LU
Phone:
01303243450
Website:

No information available