COMMUNITY SAVE A LIFE SCHEME CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of first aid training, delivering practical and online sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 November 2020: CIO registration
- CSALS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Cheryle June Berry | Chair | 12 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Timothy David Evans | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Palmer | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Andrew Ireland | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Barnett | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jill Bethell | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||
John Hutchinson | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14k | £22.34k | £19.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £13.25k | £19.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS IN ENGLAND SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO FIRST AID.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Park Hall Gardens
Walton
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S42 7NQ
- Phone:
- 07972763107
- Email:
- alan@csals.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window