BETTWS NEWYDD PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Venue for a range of village activities as well as being a provider of music, dancing and public entertainment of a similar kind.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 14 October 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MILES KENNAH | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WYNDHAM MORGAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARBARA ROSE MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.60k | £12.54k | £18.06k | £18.11k | £15.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.54k | £2.91k | £11.91k | £5.84k | £29.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £150 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £13.00k | £2.65k | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT AND TRUST DEED DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF BETTWS NEWYDD,TROSTREY AND KEMEYS COMMANDER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Bettws Newydd
USK
Gwent
NP15 1JN
- Phone:
- 01873 840521
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window