THE WORD ONE TO ONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide resources and training which enables Christian believers to confidently share the original message of the Bible with their contacts and friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 November 2020: CIO registration
- THE WORD 1-2-1 (Working name)
- WORD 121 (Working name)
- WORD 1-2-1 (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Eric Borgonon | Chair | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
David James Jackman | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Akeel Husein Kurban Sachak | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Nancy Benham MBE | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Charles Kworenga Kasenene | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.82k | £452.97k | £408.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £180.71k | £354.03k | £459.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING: 3.1.1 RESOURCES WHICH ENABLE CHRISTIAN BELIEVERS TO CONFIDENTLY SHARE THE ORIGINAL MESSAGE OF THE BIBLE WITH OTHERS; 3.1.2 TRAINING EVENTS TO MOBILIZE CHRISTIANS TO SHARE THE BIBLE WITH THEIR CONTACTS AND FRIENDS; 3.1.3 TRAINING RESOURCES TO ENABLE CHURCH LEADERS TO EQUIP THEIR OWN CONGREGATIONS TO SHARE THE BIBLE; AND 3.1.4 EVANGELISTIC EVENTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER COUNTRIES ACROSS THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARK GREEN COTTAGE
BARHATCH ROAD
CRANLEIGH
SURREY
GU6 7DJ
- Phone:
- 07890657761
- Email:
- info@theword121.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window