THE ROTARY CLUB OF SHIPLEY TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECTIVE OF THE ROTARY CLUB OF SHIPLEY IS TO UNDERTAKE FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES AND TO DISTRIBUTE THE MONIES RAISED TO A RANGE OF LOCAL CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS, TO ROTARY FOUNDATION AND THROUGH ROTARY INTERNATIONAL AND ROTARY DISTRICT APPEALS, TO A RANGE OF PROJECTS INCLUDING WORLD DISASTERS AND FAMINE RELIEF. TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE P
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Glanville Webber | Chair | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Arthur Smith | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL ILLINGWORTH CLOUGH | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allen Leslie Davis | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Terence Michael Slocombe | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.13k | £13.48k | £13.66k | £13.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.07k | £11.70k | £11.26k | £11.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECTIVE OF THE ROTARY CLUB OF SHIPLEY IS TO UNDERTAKE FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES AND TO DISTRIBUTE THE MONIES RAISED TO A RANGE OF LOCAL CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS, TO ROTARY FOUNDATION AND THROUGH ROTARY INTERNATIONAL AND ROTARY DISTRICT APPEALS, TO A RANGE OF PROJECTS INCLUDING WORLD DISASTERS AND FAMINE RELIEF. TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 STATION ROAD
CULLINGWORTH
BRADFORD
31 Station Road
Cullingworth
BD13 5HN
- Phone:
- 07342267080
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window