ALL SAINTS NURSERY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pre-school children by providing an outstanding learning environment to meet the developmental needs of all children. The association will rent premises, employ highly qualified staff, provide high quality equipment and raise money for the association's activities and play an active role in supporting the local community. To be a member of the Early Years Alliance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £97,143 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 October 2020: CIO registration
- 12 September 2024: Funds received from 803752 ALL SAINTS NURSERY SCHOOL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sallie Smith | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Blackmore | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Nicholl | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mia Davies | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Partridge | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hadler | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £146.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £160.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £97.14k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 February 2025 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 February 2025 | 243 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2023 | 329 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2023 | 329 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 3.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 3.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; 3.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO THE STATUTORY FRAMEWORK FOR THE EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION STAGE AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE EARLY YEARS ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS NURSERY SCHOOL
SHIRLEY HALL
CHURCH STREET
WHITSTABLE
CT5 1PG
- Phone:
- 01227282628
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window