THE KINGDOM CHOIR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is not yet active but its aims are the relief of those in need by reason of their age, mental health, ill-health, disability, financial hardship, or other disadvantage, to act as a resource for young people, and teaching or conducting of Gospel music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Olatunde Shosanya | Chair | 28 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Elaine Delores Simpson | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Muriel Cecile Gibson MBE | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.09k | £289 | £2.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £1.20k | £4.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1)THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, MENTAL HEALTH, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WOMEN WHO HAVE SUFFERED DOMESTIC ABUSE AND, OR SEXUAL ABUSE, AND THOSE EXPERIENCING RACE DISCRIMINATION OR SOCIAL INJUSTICE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, MENTORING, EDUCATING AND TRAINING, AND BY USING THE MEDIUM OF GOSPEL AND INSPIRATIONAL MUSIC AND SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, SOCIAL INJUSTICE MEANS A SITUATION IN WHICH THERE IS A LACK OF FAIRNESS JUSTICE OR OPPORTUNITY DUE TO SOMEONE'S SOCIAL; ECONOMIC OR RACIAL PROFILE. (2) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF ARTS AND CREATIVITY, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COURSES AND SUPPORT FOR THOSE ENGAGED IN OR ABOUT TO ENGAGE IN THE TEACHING OR CONDUCTING OF GOSPEL MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kalculus
119 Marylebone Road
London
NW1 5PU
- Phone:
- 02072234441
- Email:
- Hello@tkcfoundation.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window