3FOOD4U

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Daily Foodbank with support services and weekly Social Cafes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
340 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KALPESH KAPASIAWALA | Chair | 12 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
ED O'SHEA | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Carol Byatt | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sarbjit Singh Jandoo | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.58k | £225.02k | £223.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.73k | £192.91k | £202.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN LIVING IN SOUTH EAST ENGLAND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY OTHER CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Sun Street
Waltham Abbey
Essex
EN9 1ER
- Phone:
- 01992842642
- Email:
- info.3food4u@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window