ONE VISION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One Vision is a community project which provides practical support to vulnerable individuals and families in the district of Watford. Support is provided to those who self-identify as needing relief as a result of inequalities caused by food poverty and social deprivation. From hot meals and food parcels to mental health signposting services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £134,464 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harjit Singh Grewal | Chair | 24 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Dr Udupi Adam Tanvir Alam | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
SHARON LEONIE PLATT-MCDONALD | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
FAIZAL HAKIM | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
GILLIAN ADEBAYO | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Hyde DBE | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.58k | £140.00k | £154.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.13k | £121.00k | £150.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £126.79k | £134.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN WATFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY: 1) PROMOTING NETWORKING AND PARTNERSHIPS WITH LOCAL BUSINESS AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS THROUGH THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND CO-ORDINATED ACTIVITIES AND PROJECTS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2) PROMOTING COHESIVE COMMUNITY STRATEGIES TO ADDRESS THE PHYSICAL, SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, AND MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS OF PEOPLE IN THE LOCAL AREA REGARDLESS OF BACKGROUND OR RELIGIOUS AFFILIATIONS, THROUGH INITIATIVES AND PROJECTS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT. 3) PROVIDING PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO VULNERABLE INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WHO SELF-IDENTIFY AS BEING IN NEED OF RELIEF AS A RESULT OF INEQUALITIES CAUSED BY FOOD POVERTY AND SOCIAL DEPRIVATION, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HOT MEALS, FOOD BAGS AND OTHER ESSENTIAL ITEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ONE VISION
PENFOLD PARK
ST ALBANS ROAD
- Phone:
- 07702566667
- Email:
- enoch@ovwatford.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window