Financial history THE TRAPNELL FUND

Charity number: 517177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £113.57k £113.84k £120.28k £143.38k £154.32k
Total expenditure £120.18k £104.37k £105.36k £74.98k £56.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A