BANBURY OPERATIC SOCIETY (BOS) AND YOUTH OF BANBURY OPERATIC SOCIETY (YOBOS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oxfordshire-based musical, operatic and dramatic arts company creating theatrical productions to entertain and educate the general public. Typically performing two shows a year or a show and a concert.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Joel Melzack | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Slatter | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Ann-Calverley Briggs | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Anderson BSc, PhD | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin James Coleman PGCE, QTS | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Leslie Richard Pratt | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.76k | £54.76k | £59.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.87k | £60.91k | £55.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF BANBURY, OXFORDSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES USING THE MEDIUM OF MUSICAL, OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC ARTS AND PERFORMANCE BASED ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES:- 1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL, OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC ARTS AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH ARTS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN SAID ARTS 2.TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Foxtail Crescent
Bodicote
BANBURY
Oxfordshire
OX15 4SP
- Phone:
- 07907 067845
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window