TAIBA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the organisation will be carried out by means of, but not exclusively, making grants or loans to provide or pay for items, equipment, services and facilities, including the provision of food, clothing and water wells, as well as provision for the need of shelters and care homes in rural areas situated anywhere in the world, in particularly in Pakistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 24 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD NAEEM SIDDIQI | Chair | 22 December 2020 |
|
|||||
ADAM MUSADIQUE | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Habeeb Rahman Jamaluddin Mohamed Ibrahim | Trustee | 20 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £9.66k | £10.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £800 | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2024 | 261 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 March 2024 | 408 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2024 | 626 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN WORLD, PARTICULARLY IN THE UK AND PAKISTAN. IN PARTICULAR, THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE; VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED. RELIEF WILL BE PROVIDED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS TO PROVIDE OR PAY FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND WATER; (2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PERSONS IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION, OF FACILITIES SUCH AS MEDICAL CAMPS AND EYE CLINICS IN RURAL AREAS SITUATED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN PARTICULARLY IN PAKISTAN AND THE UK; (3) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM AND ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND WORSHIP IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM). PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FACILITIES, FOR EXAMPLE WITHIN PRIMARY EDUCATION IN RURAL AREAS AROUND THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY IN THE UK AND PAKISTAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 NORBURY HILL
LONDON
SW16 3LA
- Phone:
- 02070017770
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window