Trustees ABERTHIN VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 517376

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Minchin | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicki James | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Mitten | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Scott Alford | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Toby Lewis | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Adams | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Hughes | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Bethan Bruce | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Patterson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kate Watts | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE GOLDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.