LIVERPOOL ROAD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Christian services such as Sunday worship services, Iona worship services (Thursday AM), Weddings, Baptisms and Funerals. Girls Brigade, FACETS (pensioner activities day (Tues)), Food Pantry, Warm Space, Free Library (in partnership with Birkdale Community Hub and Library).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sefton
Governance
- 14 January 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Patrick Michael Evans | Chair | 31 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Malcolm Tate | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
Barry James Stewart | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Peter Oldham | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Oldham | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Sally Eyes | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Valerie Taberner | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Derek Taberner | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jayne Wilcox | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Doreen Susan Iddon | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Craig Horan | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Pamela Christopher | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Eileen Fyles | Trustee | 24 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Fyles | Trustee | 24 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Gillian Scott-Taggart | Trustee | 20 May 2007 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Edward France | Trustee | 23 May 2004 |
|
|
||||||
Joan Elizabeth Upton | Trustee | 23 May 2004 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Edward Taylor | Trustee | 23 May 2004 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES LLOYD | Trustee | 23 May 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.68k | £75.62k | £71.57k | £94.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.22k | £70.46k | £73.58k | £93.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 January 2023 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 January 2023 | 185 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Welwyn Avenue
SOUTHPORT
Merseyside
PR8 3BE
- Phone:
- 07813211501
- Email:
- hitasco@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window