THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, HIGHFIELDS

Charity Number: 1193247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Activities at St Peter's Highfields Religious services Provision of a variety of activities supported by the P.C.C to promote social inclusion and prevent social isolation Hire of halls for local community use

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £62,104
Total expenditure: £70,258

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 2021: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST PETER, HIGHFIELDS (Working name)
  • ST PETER, HIGHFIELDS PCC (Working name)
  • ST PETER'S HIGHFIELDS (Working name)
  • ST PETER'S, HIGHFIELDS PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Jonathan Mark Surridge Chair 29 October 2020
ST PETER'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
ALDERMAN NEWTON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP LEICESTER
Recently registered
Mia Naomi Simon Trustee 21 August 2024
None on record
Anita Fogarty Trustee 28 May 2023
None on record
Jennifer Hillhouse Trustee 28 May 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Gray Trustee 22 May 2022
ST PETER'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Jesus Brito Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Rev Caroline Brown Trustee 30 September 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP LEICESTER
Recently registered
Cynthia Geranium Simon Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Geraldine Maudrina Robbins Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Delroy Francisco Davis Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Christopher Paul Gray MMus BA Trustee 29 October 2020
THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF ORGAN STUDIES
Received: On time
Harold Hawkins Punter Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £41.66k £45.90k £62.10k
Total expenditure £35.40k £52.99k £70.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.17k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. PETERS HIGHFIELDS
2 ST. PETERS ROAD
LEICESTER
LE2 1DA
Phone:
01162553095