NOTTINGHAM SOUTH CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the faith of Christ by the holding of meeting for worship and prayer; the preaching of the gospel; the provision of religious teaching and publications; the promotion of charitable works and the provision of pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 07 April 2022: Standard registration
- NOTTINGHAM SOUTH CHRISTADELPHIAN CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Paige Evans | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN EAST | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Simon Leslie Parsons | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joseph David Ali | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE TO ADVANCE THE FAITH OF CHRIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTADELPHIAN BIRMINGHAM AMENDED STATEMENT OF FAITH (APPENDIX II) BY THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS FOR WORSHIP AND PRAYER; THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL; THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS TEACHING AND PUBLICATIONS; THE PROMOTION OF CHARITABLE WORKS AND THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nottingham South Christadelphians
Clifton Lane
Nottingham
NG11 7ES
- Phone:
- 0
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window