WIGGINTON COMMUNITY PAVILION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of Wigginton and the surrounding area the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardship or in the interests of social welfare, with the objective of improving the condition of life of the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 August 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Hurst | Chair | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Carr BSc Hons | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Marie Waddingham | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
David William Moorhouse | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Denton | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Ryding | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Scrowston BSc Econ | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ruth Denton | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.81k | £27.27k | £35.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.08k | £17.97k | £23.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WIGGINTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
John Jeffery Community Pavilion
Playing Field
Mill Lane
Wigginton
York
YO32 2PY
- Phone:
- 01904631794
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window