THE VINE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Vine Centre offers personalised support to its beneficiaries which include specialist mental health, anger management and addiction as well as support for general well being, budgeting, housing and benefits. We offer training opportunities, help to find employment and online IT courses. Our offer includes numeracy and literacy support, groups to stop social isolation and art therapy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £43,709 from 8 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 February 2021: CIO registration
- 25 November 2021: Funds received from 1095915 THE VINE CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Tilley | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Harris | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Cathy Berry | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rosling | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Bellwood | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Bellwood | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Steventon | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £384.00k | £377.90k | £363.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £313.60k | £330.34k | £351.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.60k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £94.40k | £89.00k | £43.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A CENTRE AND SERVICES, WHICH OFFER INFORMATION, ADVICE, ADVOCACY, TRAINING, COUNSELLING AND HEALTH CARE SERVICES AND WELFARE AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES TO ITS CLIENTS, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE VULNERABLE BY HOMELESSNESS, UNEMPLOYMENT, MENTAL HEALTH, LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, ADDICTION, POVERTY OR OTHER SOCIAL DEPRIVATION, TO REDUCE SOCIAL ISOLATION, ENABLE CHANGE AND IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VINE CENTRE
33 STATION ROAD
ALDERSHOT
GU11 1BA
- Phone:
- 01252400196
- Email:
- info@thevinecentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window