KORPU BUILDING BRIDGES WITH THE WORLD LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bible translation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Azerbaijan
Governance
- 06 September 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FERIDOON MOKHOF | Chair | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Karami | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|||||
MATT JEREMY MERRITT | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mokhof | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/09/2022 | 05/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.27k | £23.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.24k | £19.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 September 2022
(These accounts |
12 July 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICLUAR BUT NOT EXCUSIVELY: PRODUCING MEDIA PRODUCTIONS BASED ON BIBLE TRANSLATIONS IN PARTNERSHIP WITH INTERNATIONAL BIBLE TRANSLATION ORGANISATIONS; AND FACILITATING AND MANAGING TRANSLATION OF THE BIBLE INTO DIFFERENT COLLOQUIAL LANGUAGES OF PEOPLE GROUPS IN PARTNERSHIP WITH NATIONAL CHURCHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 ROXBURGH CLOSE
CAMBERLEY
GU15 1AS
- Phone:
- 07532743955
- Email:
- fmokhof@korpu.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window