UNEXPECTED PLACES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of performing arts activities, with a particular focus on children and young people through drama classes, creative and sensory play classes, workshops and outreach projects in Hampshire. Performing original devised productions to the local community and training the next generation of theatre makers through our innovative and supportive youth theatre programme, Light UP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £8,894 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 June 2021: Standard registration
- LIGHT UP (Working name)
- UNEXPECTED PLACES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Adams | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juli Richards | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Roberta Comunian | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Sloan | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Rosanna Louise Houston | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.21k | £145.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.40k | £156.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £8.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE PERFORMING ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS IN ACTING AND ARTISTIC PERFORMANCE WHICH DEVELOP KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS, CONFIDENCE AND CREATIVITY; B) DELIVERING HIGH QUALITY ORIGINAL THEATRE PERFORMANCES FOR PUBLIC PRESENTATION; C) THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN OTHER AREAS OF THEATRE PRODUCTION INCLUDING WORKING BACKSTAGE, LIGHTING, SOUND AND PRODUCTION DESIGN. D) THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN CREATIVE EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES SUCH AS ARTS TRAILS, FESTIVALS AND EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1
Emsworth Road
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 3LX
- Phone:
- 07483239331
- Email:
- info@lightupdrama.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window