Trustees MEON VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1195360

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip John Griffin | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Mary Scovronski | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Firth | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Saunders | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Barber | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Kathleen Daniels | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham David Barber | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Mary Elizabeth Sealey | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Henry Tizzard | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Anouska Kirby | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Chester | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patricia Gilbert | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth June Sorsky | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Gamblin | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Sarah Miller | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jay Carl Kirby | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Geoffery Hallam | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robin James Pye | Trustee | 01 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
John Cundall Sargent | Trustee | 01 September 2006 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOHN MORGAN | Trustee | 01 September 2001 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Freemantle | Trustee | 01 September 2001 |
|
|
||||
Sam Charles | Trustee | 21 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE VERNON SUTTON | Trustee | 01 September 1989 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Mary Sutton | Trustee | 01 September 1986 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Elizabeth Byrne | Trustee | 01 September 1980 |
|
|
||||
RONALD CHARLES MORGAN | Trustee | 01 September 1975 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.