ORFORD AND DISTRICT SURGERY CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness and to preserve health by the ownership and the maintenance, reconstruction, improvement and general upkeep and management of the building at Chapman House, Rectory Road, Orford, Woodbridge, Suffolk which is used as a general medical practitioners' surgery and in the provision of medical facilities, equipment and services not normally provided by statutory authorities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 June 2021: CIO registration
- 27 October 2022: Funds received from 281118 ORFORD AND DISTRICT SURGERY CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Hester Norah Silver-Murphy | Chair | 09 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Alexander Ife | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Jeremy Addy | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven Joels | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Pick | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Margaret Wells | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Amanda Gayle Syrett | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Goldin FRCP | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
HH John Penry Vaughan Bevan QC | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Lusher | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £13.99k | £26.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £13.47k | £14.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE HEALTH BY THE OWNERSHIP AND THE MAINTENANCE, RECONSTRUCTION, IMPROVEMENT AND GENERAL UPKEEP AND MANAGEMENT OF THE BUILDING AT CHAPMAN HOUSE, RECTORY ROAD, ORFORD, WOODBRIDGE, SUFFOLK WHICH IS USED AS A GENERAL MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS' SURGERY AND IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF ORFORD AND GEDGRAVE, SUDBOURNE, IKEN, CHILLESFORD AND BUTLEY ("THE PARISHES") 3.2 IF ANY PART OF THE INCOME OR CAPITAL IS NOT REQUIRED FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES SET OUT IN CLAUSE 3.1 ABOVE, FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOCTORS SURGERY
CHAPMAN HOUSE
RECTORY ROAD
ORFORD
WOODBRIDGE
IP12 2NN
- Phone:
- 01394450849
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window