WARWICK DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGEMENT AND OPERATION OF A LOCAL SCOUT DISTRICT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 15 March 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN LESLIE RUSSELL | Chair | 12 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Wakeley | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Drew McNeill | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Louise Kendall | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ann Rickard | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Stockbridge | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.03k | £112.78k | £163.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.98k | £93.18k | £140.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 227 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 ALL SAINTS ROAD
WARWICK
CV34 5NN
- Phone:
- 07526649210
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window