THE IOE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help focus our work and measure our impact, we will focus our grant making in the following areas - 1. The advancement of education of young people within the ages of 16-25 years in the UK; 2. The advancement of education by supporting education initiatives at schools, colleges and universities; 3. Working in partnership with like-minded charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARCEL HUGO LANDAU | Chair | 05 July 2022 |
|
|||||
ANDREW GARNET GIBSON | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAYGE ELIZABETHANN AITCHISON | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ELIZABETH MARGARET RUSTOMJI | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
VERA DOROTHY MCWILLIAM | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.00k | £50.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15 | £22.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN EXPORT AND INTERNATIONAL TRADE WITHIN THE AGES OF 16-25 YEARS IN THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL GRANTS WHICH SUPPORT EDUCATION INITIATIVES AT SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIOET
EXPORT HOUSE
MINERVA BUSINESS PARK
LYNCH WOOD
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 6FT
- Phone:
- 01733731169
- Email:
- jeanny.luong@export.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window