TTPNETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE EXPERIENCING OR AFFECTED BY THROMBOTIC THROMBOCYTOPENIC PURPURA (TTP) IN THE UK AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND WITH AN INTERNATIONAL REACH. BY:- THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT, REPRESENTATION AND ADVOCACY. TO IMPROVE EQUITY OF ACCESS TO TREATMENTS, PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE AND PROMOTE BEST PRACTICE AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN TTP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 09 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirandeep Kaur Grewal | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Julie Hallam | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Howell OBE | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Saida Banu Ladha | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.61k | £25.27k | £44.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £311 | £2.47k | £24.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS EXPERIENCING OR AFFECTED BY THROMBOTIC THROMBOCYTOPENIC PURPURA (TTP) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND WITH AN INTERNATIONAL REACH. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY:- THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT, REPRESENTATION AND ADVOCACY IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE EQUITY OF ACCESS TO TREATMENTS, PRESERVE LIFE AND TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE; PROMOTING BEST PRACTICE AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF TTP IN RELATION TO THE CAUSE, DIAGNOSES, PREVENTION, ALLEVIATION, TREATMENTS AND CURE BY RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDING INFORMATION TO THE PUBLIC AND HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS NATIONALLY, AND INTERNATIONALLY; REPRESENTING THE PATIENT VOICE AND STRENGTHEN PATIENT ADVOCACY ON UK AND INTERNATIONAL GOVERNMENT AND NON-GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTAL BODIES AND IN CONSULTATIONS; PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE FOR THE CARRYING OUT OF RESEARCH BY MAKING GRANTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF PATIENTS WITH TTP; GENERATING INCOME THROUGH FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF IMPROVING PATIENT CARE; ENGAGING IN NONPARTISAN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS; AND INTERFACING WITH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND CORPORATE PARTNERS TO COLLABORATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND)ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Bridge Street
KINGTON
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 0740 393 2525
- Email:
- info@ttpnetwork.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window