JEANS FOR GENES CAMPAIGN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support charities, groups and individuals working with people and families affected by genetic conditions, primarily through grant giving. To advance the education of the public, raise awareness and influence on the subject of genetic conditions for the benefit of those directly experiencing genetic conditions, or those supporting affected individuals and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 May 2021: Standard registration
- JEANS FOR GENES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Creamer | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Griffin | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Seaby | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chikai Lai | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £494.36k | £434.79k | £406.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £433.87k | £517.54k | £350.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2023
Charitable objects
5 THE CHARITIES OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 5.1 TO SUPPORT CHARITIES, GROUPS AND INDIVIDUALS WORKING WITH PEOPLE AND FAMILIES AFFECTED BY GENETIC CONDITIONS, PRIMARILY THROUGH GRANT GIVING. 5.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, CURE, PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF GENETIC DISORDERS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; AND 5.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, RAISE AWARENESS AND INFLUENCE ON THE SUBJECT OF GENETIC CONDITIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE DIRECTLY EXPERIENCING GENETIC CONDITIONS, OR THOSE SUPPORTING AFFECTED INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jeans for Genes Campaign
Nightingale House
46-48 East Street
EPSOM
Surrey
KT17 1HQ
- Phone:
- 08009804800
- Email:
- hello@jeansforgenes.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window