BATTLE BACK GOLF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Battle Back Golf delivers golfing education programmes and competitive opportunities to wounded, injured and sick Royal Navy, Army and Royal Air Force personnel and veterans, using golf as part of their physical and cognitive rehabilitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tristan Alexander Crew MBE | Chair | 20 May 2021 |
|
|||||
David John Iliffe | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN ANDREW HART | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.74k | £22.99k | £35.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.08k | £31.01k | £31.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF BATTLE BACK GOLF IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ROYAL NAVY, ARMY AND ROYAL AIR FORCE PERSONNEL AND VETERANS EXPERIENCING ENDURING ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY BY THE PROVISION OF, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY A SERIES OF PROGRESSIVE STRUCTURED AND SEMI-STRUCTURED GOLFING OPPORTUNITIES TO ENHANCE THEIR PHYSICAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL AND COGNITIVE REHABILITATION THROUGH UTILISING DIVERSE AND SOCIALLY INCLUSIVE ENVIRONMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAPLAINS HOUSE
ASHBY ROAD
RAVENSTONE
COALVILLE
LE67 2AA
- Phone:
- 07877022146
- Email:
- battlebackgolf@gmail.com
- Website:
-
Battlebackgolf.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window