THE KELLY FITZGIBBONS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To do
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Ambler | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Kerri Harris | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dent | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £104.94k | £7.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.21k | £3.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 370 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2025 | 727 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2025 | 727 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES FROM FAMILICIDE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: • SUPPORTING VICTIMS, FAMILIES AND THOSE INDIVIDUALS IMPACTED BY THE ACT OF FAMILICIDE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THEIR MENTAL HEALTH AND THROUGH PROVIDING GRANTS TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP CAUSED BY FAMILICIDE. • RAISING AWARENESS AND EDUCATING VICTIMS OF SUCH CRIMES AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON MATTERS RELATING TO THE ACT OF FAMILICIDE AND THE EFFECTS OF SUCH CRIMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 DENFORD GROVE
BIRMINGHAM
B14 6LY
- Phone:
- 07775621784
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window