Financial history The Foundation Charity of Bishop Vesey's Grammar School

Charity number: 517907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £288.23k £643.62k £200.61k £264.28k £1.62m
Total expenditure £131.60k £329.48k £512.04k £255.29k £245.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £94.18k N/A N/A £1.41m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £105.96k N/A N/A £75.84k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £125.16k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £329.48k N/A N/A £245.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £8.40k N/A N/A £12.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £213.46k N/A N/A £232.79k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0