BRIDGEND INCLUSIVE NETWORK GROUP (BING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bridgend Inclusive Network Group (BING) is a new and exciting social enterprise that supports the Bridgend Inclusive Community. All our volunteers have a variety of personal experiences, expertise, and in-depth knowledge of the voluntary sector such as charities, community groups, sports clubs and not for profit organisations in which we want to share.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bridgend
Governance
- 02 December 2021: CIO registration
- BING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leanne Michelle Toy | Chair | 22 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Emily Rachel Evans | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anita Dawn Davies | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Bowman | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £15.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £23.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (INCLUDING THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES/CARERS) OF BRIDGEND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE IMPACTED BY DISABILITY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS, THROUGH THEIR LOCAL VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR EXPERIENCE OF OR ASSOCIATION WITH DISABLEMENT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 SUFFOLK PLACE
PORTHCAWL
CF36 3EB
- Phone:
- 07943868035
- Email:
- Leanne.toy@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window